Director
The director is appointed by the Government of Catalonia on the proposal of the Minister of the Ministry responsible for managing and coordinating the Statistics System of Catalonia.
It is the director's responsibility to represent Idescat and manage and coordinate its activities.
For a more detailed description of the functions carried out by the director of Idescat, refer to Decree 24/2014, from the 25th February, on the organisation and operation of the Statistical Institute of Catalonia.
Director
- Mr. Xavier Cuadras Morató
Previous directors
From | To | |
---|---|---|
Mr. Frederic Udina i Abelló | 07/07/2011 | 30/05/2019 |
Ms. Anna Ventura i Estalella | 19/04/2007 | 07/07/2011 |
Mr. Josep Maria Vegara i Carrió | 05/02/2004 | 12/04/2007 |
Mr. Jordi Oliveras i Prats | 12/01/1990 | 05/02/2004 |